Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 08/03/1988
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 08/03/1988
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 08/03/1988
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 08/03/1988
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 08/04/1988
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 08/04/1988
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 08/04/1988
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 08/04/1988
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 08/04/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 09/07/1988
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/07/1988
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/07/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 09/07/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 09/07/1988
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/07/1988
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 09/07/1988
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 09/07/1988
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 09/07/1988
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/07/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 09/07/1988
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 09/07/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/07/1988
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/07/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 09/22/1988
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/22/1988
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/22/1988
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/22/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/22/1988
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/22/1988
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 09/22/1988
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/22/1988
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 09/22/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 09/22/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 09/22/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 10/05/1988
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/05/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 10/19/1988
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 10/19/1988