Summary: H.R.5329 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for H.R.5329. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/16/1988)

Immigration Nursing Relief Act of 1988 - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to grant special immigrant status to an immigrant (and accompanying spouse and children): (1) who entered the United States before January 1, 1988, as a nonimmigrant to perform services as a registered nurse; (2) who is working in such capacity with a valid visa as of the date of enactment of this Act; and (3) with respect to whom a labor certification has been filed prior to the granting of special immigrant status.

Sets forth the following conditions for admission of nonimmigrant nurses during the five-year period beginning on April 1, 1989: (1) a professional nursing license from the country where the alien studied nursing or a degree from a U.S. or Canadian nursing school; (2) completion of an appropriate examination or possession of a license in the State of intended employment; (3) such alien's employment will not adversely affect wages and working conditions of similarly employed nurses; (4) a substantial disruption of the hiring health facility's services will occur without the services of such alien; (5) the facility has taken steps toward recruitment and retention of U.S. citizens or immigrant nurses; and (6) there is no ongoing labor dispute or related activity at such facility.

Provides for an initial admission period of up to three years, with extensions up to a five-year total (six years under extraordinary circumstances).

Directs the Secretary of Labor to provide for the appointment by April 1, 1990, of an advisory group to advise the Secretary: (1) concerning the impact of this Act on the nursing shortage; (2) regarding programs to recruit U.S. citizens or immigrant nurses; and (3) regarding the advisability of extending the provisions of this Act beyond April 1, 1994.

Directs the Secretary to conduct a study and report to the Congress by April 1, 1991, regarding the amendments made by this Act.