Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/30/1988
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/30/1988
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 09/30/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/30/1988
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/30/1988
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 09/30/1988
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 09/30/1988
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/03/1988
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/04/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 10/04/1988
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 10/04/1988
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 10/04/1988
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 10/04/1988
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 10/06/1988
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 10/06/1988
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/06/1988
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 10/06/1988
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 10/12/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/12/1988
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/13/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 10/13/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 10/13/1988
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 10/13/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/18/1988
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 10/18/1988
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 10/20/1988
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/20/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 10/20/1988
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 10/21/1988