Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Alcoholic Beverage Labeling Act of 1988

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to require the labeling of alcoholic beverages.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/28/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
10/24/1988Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/22/1988For Further Action See H.R.5210.
10/05/1988Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/28/1988Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/1988Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/1988Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 09/28/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 09/28/1988
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 10/13/1988
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 10/13/1988
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 10/13/1988
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 10/13/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 10/13/1988

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/28/1988 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment10/24/1988 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/28/1988 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade10/05/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5409. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/28/1988)

Alcoholic Beverage Labeling Act of 1988 - Prohibits manufacturing, importing, or bottling for sale or distribution in the United States any alcoholic beverage unless its container bears a Government warning statement that: (1) according to the Surgeon General, women should not drink alcohol during pregnancy because of the risk of birth defects; and (2) consumption of alcoholic beverages impairs the ability to drive a car or operate machinery and may cause other health problems.

Sets forth location and type size requirements for such statement.

Makes such requirement inapplicable to alcoholic beverages for export from the United States or for delivery to a vessel or aircraft as supplier for consumption beyond the jurisdiction of U.S. internal revenue laws. Applies such requirement to those for sale, distribution, or shipment to members or units of the armed forces, including those located outside the United States.

Sets forth civil penalties for violations of this Act. Authorizes the Secretary of the Treasury (the Secretary) to compromise, modify, or remit, with or without conditions, any such penalty.

Vests jurisdiction to issue injunctions against such violations in U.S. district courts, upon application of the Attorney General acting through U.S. attorneys.

Prohibits State law from requiring any alcohol and health statement, other than that required by this Act or other Federal law on any container of an alcoholic beverage, or any other package containing such container.

Directs the Secretary to report promptly to the Congress any recommendations for amendments to this Act that are appropriate and in the public interest, upon finding that available scientific information would justify a change in, addition to, or deletion of all or part of such a statement after an appropriate investigation and consultation with the Surgeon General carried out after 24 months after the enactment of this Act.

Directs the Secretary to promulgate regulations regarding implementation of this Act.