Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 09/30/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 09/30/1988
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 09/30/1988
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 10/12/1988
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/12/1988
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/12/1988
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 10/12/1988
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/12/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/12/1988
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 10/12/1988
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 10/12/1988
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/12/1988
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 10/12/1988
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 10/12/1988
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/12/1988
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/12/1988
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 10/13/1988
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 10/18/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 10/21/1988
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/21/1988