Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Freedom From Vertical Price Fixing Act of 1987

Short Titles as Reported to House

Freedom From Vertical Price Fixing Act of 1987

Short Titles as Introduced

Freedom From Vertical Price Fixing Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to establish evidentiary standards for Federal civil antitrust claims based on resale price fixing.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/09/1987Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
11/04/1987Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-421.
01/08/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
11/10/1987SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
11/09/1987HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
11/09/1987HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
11/04/1987HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 272.
11/04/1987HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-421.
10/20/1987HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
10/20/1987HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/14/1987HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Monopolies and Commercial Law
10/14/1987HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Monopolies and Commercial Law
04/02/1987HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Monopolies and Commercial Law
02/10/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Monopolies and Commercial Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/08/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
01/08/1987HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/08/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/01/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 04/01/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/01/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 04/01/1987
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 04/01/1987
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/01/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/01/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 04/01/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/01/1987
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/01/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 04/01/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/01/1987
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 04/01/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/01/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/01/1987
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 04/01/1987
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/01/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/01/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 04/01/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 04/01/1987
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/01/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/01/1987
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/01/1987
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 04/01/1987
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 04/01/1987
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 04/01/1987
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/01/1987
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/06/1987
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 05/06/1987
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 05/06/1987
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/06/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/06/1987
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/06/1987
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/06/1987
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 05/06/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/06/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/06/1987
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 05/06/1987
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/16/1987
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/16/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/16/1987
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/16/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/16/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/16/1987
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 06/16/1987
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 06/16/1987
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/16/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/16/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/16/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/16/1987
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 06/16/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 06/16/1987
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/16/1987
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 06/16/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 08/07/1987
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/21/1987
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 09/21/1987
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 09/21/1987
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 09/21/1987

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/08/1987 Referred to
10/20/1987 Markup by
11/04/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-421
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Monopolies and Commercial Law02/10/1987 Referred to
04/02/1987 Hearings by
10/14/1987 Markup by
10/14/1987 Reported by
Senate Judiciary11/10/1987 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.585.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.585. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/09/1987)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Freedom From Vertical Price Fixing Act of 1987 - Provides that in a civil antitrust action relating to price fixing under the Sherman Act, evidence that a seller terminated the sale or supply of goods or services to a dealer in response to a communication about price competition from a competitor of such dealer shall be sufficient to raise the inference that such manufacturer and competitor engaged in price fixing. Provides that a termination or a refusal to supply is in response to a communication if such communication is a substantial contributing cause of such termination or refusal to supply. Declares that nothing shall preclude the court from entering judgment in favor of the defendant if the court determines on the basis of all the evidence that no such inference of concerted action can reasonably be drawn by a trier of fact.

Provides that evidence that the seller and a purchaser of goods or services agreed to establish the resale price of such good or service shall be sufficient to establish that such seller and purchaser engaged in price fixing.