Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 01/20/1987
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 02/04/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/04/1987
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 02/04/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 02/04/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 02/04/1987
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 02/04/1987
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 02/04/1987
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 02/04/1987
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 02/04/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 02/04/1987
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/04/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/04/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/04/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 02/04/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 02/04/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 02/04/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 02/04/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 02/04/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/04/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 02/04/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/04/1987
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/04/1987
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 02/04/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/04/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/04/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 02/04/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 02/04/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/04/1987
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 02/04/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/04/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 02/04/1987
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/04/1987
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 02/04/1987
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 02/04/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 02/04/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/04/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 02/04/1987
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 02/04/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/04/1987
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 02/04/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 02/04/1987
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 02/04/1987
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 02/04/1987
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 02/04/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 02/04/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 02/04/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/04/1987
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/04/1987
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/04/1987
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 02/04/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/04/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/04/1987
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 02/04/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 02/04/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 02/04/1987
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/04/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 02/04/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/04/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/04/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 02/04/1987
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 02/04/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/04/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/04/1987
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 02/04/1987
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 02/04/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 02/04/1987
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/04/1987
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 02/04/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 02/04/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 02/04/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/02/1987
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 03/02/1987
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/02/1987
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/02/1987
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 03/02/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/02/1987
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 03/02/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 03/02/1987
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/02/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/02/1987
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/02/1987
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 03/02/1987
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/02/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/02/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/02/1987
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 03/02/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/03/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/03/1987
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/03/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/03/1987
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 03/05/1987
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/05/1987
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 03/05/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/05/1987
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 03/05/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 03/10/1987
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/10/1987
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/10/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/10/1987
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 03/10/1987
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/10/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/11/1987
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/16/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/16/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 03/16/1987
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/16/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/16/1987
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/18/1987
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 03/18/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/18/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/25/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 03/25/1987
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 03/25/1987
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 03/25/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 03/25/1987
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 03/30/1987
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/30/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/30/1987
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 03/30/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 03/30/1987
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 03/30/1987
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/01/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/01/1987
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 04/02/1987
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 04/02/1987
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 04/07/1987
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/07/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/07/1987
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 04/07/1987
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 04/07/1987
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 04/08/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/08/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/09/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 04/09/1987
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 04/27/1987
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 04/27/1987
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/27/1987
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 04/27/1987
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 05/07/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/11/1987
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/08/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/08/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/08/1987
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 06/10/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/10/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/10/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/11/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 06/11/1987
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/18/1987
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/18/1987
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/18/1987
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 06/24/1987
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/24/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/26/1987
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 07/08/1987
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/08/1987
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/08/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 07/13/1987
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/20/1987