Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Civil Rights Amendments Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to prohibit discrimination on the basis of affectional or sexual orientation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/21/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
02/23/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Employment Opportunities.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
02/10/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/21/1987Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/21/1987Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/21/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 01/21/1987
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 01/21/1987
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/21/1987
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 02/26/1987
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 02/26/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/26/1987
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 02/26/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 02/26/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 02/26/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 02/26/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 02/26/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 02/26/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 02/26/1987
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/19/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 03/19/1987
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/08/1987
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/06/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/04/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/10/1987
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/08/1987
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 07/22/1987
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/06/1987
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 10/15/1987
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 10/27/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/16/1988
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/04/1988

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor01/21/1987 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Employment Opportunities02/23/1987 Referred to
House Judiciary01/21/1987 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights02/10/1987 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.709. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/21/1987)

Civil Rights Amendments Act of 1987 - Amends the Civil Rights Act of 1964 to prohibit discrimination on the basis of affectional or sexual orientation. Provides that this Act shall not be construed to permit a finding of discrimination based on statistical differences or the fashioning of any remedy requiring a quota.