Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Preborn Children's Civil Rights Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to protect the life of a preborn child.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/22/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
02/23/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
02/23/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Employment Opportunities.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
02/23/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Select Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
02/18/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
02/18/1987Executive Comment Requested from OMB, OPM.
02/10/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/02/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/22/1987Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/1987Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/1987Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/1987Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 01/22/1987
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 01/22/1987
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 01/22/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/04/1987
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 02/04/1987
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 02/04/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 02/04/1987
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42] 02/04/1987
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 02/04/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/04/1987
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 02/19/1987
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/19/1987
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/19/1987
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/19/1987
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 02/19/1987
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 03/12/1987
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 03/12/1987
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/08/1987
Rep. Sweeney, David McCann [R-TX-14] 05/28/1987
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/28/1987
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 05/28/1987

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor01/22/1987 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Select Education02/23/1987 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Employment Opportunities02/23/1987 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education02/23/1987 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/22/1987 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment02/02/1987 Referred to
House Judiciary01/22/1987 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights02/10/1987 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service01/22/1987 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits02/18/1987 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.720.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.720. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/22/1987)

Preborn Children's Civil Rights Act of 1987 - Prohibits the use of Federal funds to perform, promote, or do research on any procedure to take the life of a preborn child (except for medical procedures required to prevent the death of either the pregnant women or her preborn child).

Prohibits the Federal Government from entering into any contract for insurance which provides for payment or reimbursement for abortion services.

States that no institution receiving Federal financial assistance shall: (1) discriminate against any employee, applicant, or student on the basis of that person's opposition to abortion; or (2) require any employee or student to participate, directly or indirectly, in abortion procedures, counseling, or an insurance program which includes abortion coverage.

States that attorney's fees shall not be allowed in any civil action involving a law prohibiting or restricting abortions.

Provides for Supreme Court review of lower court decisions which declare State and local anti-abortion statutes unconstitutional.