Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to exempt retired members of the Armed Forces called to active duty and assigned to full-time duty with the American Battle Monuments Commission from grade limitations on officers of the Armed Forces.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/30/1987Reported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 100-75 (Part I).
01/22/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date
08/06/1987Executive Comment Received From Army.
08/04/1987Executive Comment Received From Army.
04/30/1987Reported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 100-75 (Part I).
04/23/1987Ordered to be Reported.
04/23/1987Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/19/1987Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Housing and Memorial Affairs
03/19/1987Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Housing and Memorial Affairs
03/19/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Housing and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/20/1987Executive Comment Received From American Battle Monuments Comm.
02/11/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
02/06/1987Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
02/03/1987Executive Comment Requested from American Battle Monuments Comm.
01/22/1987Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/1987Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services01/22/1987 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation02/11/1987 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs01/22/1987 Referred to
04/23/1987 Markup by
04/30/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-75 Part 1
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Housing and Memorial Affairs03/19/1987 Referred to
03/19/1987 Markup by
03/19/1987 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.733.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.733. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/22/1987)

Amends Federal military personnel provisions to exempt retired members of the armed forces who are called to active, full-time duty with the American Battle Monuments Commission from certain number and grade limitations on officers of the armed forces.