Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 01/27/1987
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 01/27/1987
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 01/28/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 01/28/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 01/28/1987
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 02/02/1987
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 02/02/1987
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 02/02/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 02/02/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/02/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 02/02/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/02/1987
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 02/02/1987
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 02/02/1987
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/02/1987
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 02/18/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/18/1987
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/18/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/18/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/18/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 02/18/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 02/18/1987
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 02/18/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/18/1987
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 02/19/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 02/19/1987
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 02/19/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 02/19/1987
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 02/25/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/25/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 02/25/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/25/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/25/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/25/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 03/12/1987
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 03/12/1987
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 03/12/1987
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/12/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 03/12/1987
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 03/12/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 03/12/1987
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 03/12/1987
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/30/1987
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/30/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 03/30/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/07/1987
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 04/07/1987
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/22/1987
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 04/22/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 05/04/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/04/1987
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/04/1987
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/04/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/04/1987
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 05/04/1987
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 05/04/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/04/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 05/04/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/12/1987
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/18/1987
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 05/28/1987
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/10/1987
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/10/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/10/1987
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 07/01/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 07/15/1987
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/21/1987
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/21/1987
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 08/03/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/13/1987
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/04/1988
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/21/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/01/1988
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 07/26/1988

Show cosponsors who withdrew