Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/03/1987
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/05/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/05/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/09/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/09/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/18/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/30/1987
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 02/01/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/21/1988
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 03/21/1988
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 04/21/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/03/1988
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 08/03/1988