Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to reinstate a 5 percent investment tax credit after 1987 for certain property.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/03/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/03/1987Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (34)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/03/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 02/05/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 02/05/1987
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 02/05/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 02/05/1987
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/05/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 02/05/1987
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 02/05/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 02/05/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/05/1987
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 03/03/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 03/03/1987
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12] 03/03/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 03/03/1987
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 03/03/1987
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 03/03/1987
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 03/11/1987
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/11/1987
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 03/11/1987
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/11/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/11/1987
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 03/11/1987
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/11/1987
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/25/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/25/1987
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/19/1987
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 07/08/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/31/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/31/1988
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 03/31/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/19/1988
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 04/19/1988
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 04/28/1988
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 09/07/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/03/1987 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.936.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.936. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/03/1987)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow a five-percent investment tax credit after 1987 for tangible property which: (1) is used as a part of manufacturing, production, or extraction or of furnishing transportation, communications, electrical energy, gas, water, or sewage disposal services; (2) constitutes a research facility used in connection with such activities; or (3) constitutes a facility used in connection with such activities for the bulk storage of fungible commodities.