Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 02/03/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 02/03/1987
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/03/1987
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 02/03/1987
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 02/03/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 02/03/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 02/03/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 02/03/1987
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/03/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/03/1987
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 03/24/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 03/24/1987
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 03/24/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 03/24/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/24/1987
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 04/08/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/28/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/28/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 04/28/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/28/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/28/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/28/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/28/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 05/28/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 05/28/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/28/1987
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/28/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 05/28/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/28/1987
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 05/28/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/28/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/28/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/28/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/28/1987
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 05/28/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/28/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/28/1987
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/03/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/03/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/03/1987
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 06/23/1987
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 06/23/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/23/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/30/1987
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 06/30/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/30/1987
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 06/30/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/30/1987
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/30/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/30/1987
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 07/08/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 07/08/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 07/08/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/08/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/22/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 07/22/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/22/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/22/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 07/22/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 07/22/1987
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/22/1987
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/29/1987
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/29/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 08/05/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 08/05/1987
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 08/05/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/17/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 09/17/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/17/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 09/17/1987
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 09/17/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 09/17/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 09/17/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 09/17/1987
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/17/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 09/17/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/17/1987
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/17/1987
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 09/29/1987
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 09/29/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/29/1987
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 10/01/1987
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 10/01/1987