Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 02/04/1987
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 02/04/1987
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/04/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 02/10/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 02/10/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/10/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 02/10/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 02/10/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/10/1987
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 02/10/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/10/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 02/10/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/18/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/18/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/18/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 02/18/1987
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/18/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 02/18/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 02/18/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 02/23/1987
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 02/23/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/05/1987
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/25/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/25/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/25/1987