Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 06/03/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/01/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/01/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 07/01/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/30/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 07/30/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/30/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/06/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 08/06/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 08/06/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 08/06/1987
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/07/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 08/07/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 08/07/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 09/09/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/09/1987
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12] 09/09/1987
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/17/1987
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 10/29/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 12/18/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 12/18/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 12/18/1987
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 12/18/1987
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 12/18/1987
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 12/18/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 12/18/1987
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 12/18/1987
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 12/18/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 12/18/1987
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 12/18/1987
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 12/18/1987
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 12/18/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 12/18/1987
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 12/18/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 12/21/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 12/21/1987
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 12/21/1987
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 02/03/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 02/03/1988
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 02/03/1988
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/03/1988
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 02/03/1988
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 02/03/1988
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 02/03/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/03/1988
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 02/03/1988
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/03/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/03/1988
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/03/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 03/03/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/03/1988
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/03/1988
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 03/03/1988
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 03/03/1988
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/03/1988
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 03/03/1988
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/03/1988
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 03/03/1988
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/03/1988
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 03/03/1988
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/03/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 03/03/1988
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 03/03/1988
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/03/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 03/03/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 03/03/1988
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 03/03/1988
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 03/03/1988
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/03/1988
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/03/1988
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/03/1988
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/03/1988
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/03/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 03/03/1988
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/03/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/03/1988
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/03/1988
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/03/1988
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 03/29/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/29/1988
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 03/29/1988
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/29/1988
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 03/29/1988
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/29/1988
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/29/1988
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 03/29/1988
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/29/1988
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/29/1988
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 03/29/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/29/1988
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 03/29/1988
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/28/1988
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 04/28/1988
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 04/28/1988
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 04/28/1988
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 04/28/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 04/28/1988
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 04/28/1988
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42] 04/28/1988
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 04/28/1988
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/12/1988
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 05/12/1988
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 05/12/1988
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 05/12/1988
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 05/12/1988
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 05/23/1988
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 05/23/1988
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 05/23/1988
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/23/1988
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/23/1988
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/23/1988
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/24/1988
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/24/1988
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 05/24/1988
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/24/1988
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/24/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/24/1988
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 05/24/1988
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 05/24/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 05/24/1988