Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A concurrent resolution to request that the President submit a report to Congress regarding the stability of the Government of Panama.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/29/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
07/29/1988Referred to Subcommittee on Panama Canal and Outer Continental Shelf.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
07/29/1988Executive Comment Requested from State, Panama Canal Comm, DOD.
07/11/1988Referred to Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/11/1988Referred to Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/29/1988Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/1988Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/1988Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 06/29/1988
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 07/06/1988
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 07/06/1988
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/06/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/06/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/12/1988
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 07/12/1988
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 07/12/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/26/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/26/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 07/26/1988
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 08/01/1988
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 08/01/1988
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 08/01/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 08/01/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/01/1988
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 08/01/1988
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 08/01/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 08/01/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 08/04/1988
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 08/04/1988
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 08/04/1988
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 08/09/1988
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 08/09/1988
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 08/09/1988
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/09/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/09/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 09/09/1988
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 09/09/1988
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 09/09/1988
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/21/1988

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/29/1988 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science07/11/1988 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs07/11/1988 Referred to
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries06/29/1988 Referred to
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Panama Canal and Outer Continental Shelf07/29/1988 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.326.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.326. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/29/1988)

Finds that recent events in Panama indicate a political environment in which the Government of Panama is becoming increasingly unstable and more hostile toward the United States.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that the President should submit an unclassified report to the Congress addressing: (1) the stability of the Panamanian Government; (2) the likelihood of compliance by the Panamanian Government with the Neutrality Treaty and the Statement of Understanding guaranteeing transit of vessels, including U.S. war vessels, through the Panama Canal; (3) U.S. options regarding the transfer of the Canal; and (4) U.S. options, following transfer of the Canal to Panama, if the Canal is being used for illicit drug trafficking.