Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 06/29/1988
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 07/06/1988
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 07/06/1988
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/06/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/06/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/12/1988
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 07/12/1988
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 07/12/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/26/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/26/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 07/26/1988
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 08/01/1988
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 08/01/1988
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 08/01/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 08/01/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/01/1988
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 08/01/1988
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 08/01/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 08/01/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 08/04/1988
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 08/04/1988
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 08/04/1988
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 08/09/1988
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 08/09/1988
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 08/09/1988
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/09/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/09/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 09/09/1988
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 09/09/1988
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 09/09/1988
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/21/1988