Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 01/29/1987
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 01/29/1987
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 01/29/1987
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 01/29/1987
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 01/29/1987
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 02/10/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 02/10/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/10/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 02/10/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 02/10/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 02/10/1987
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12] 02/10/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/10/1987
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/10/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 02/10/1987
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 02/10/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 02/10/1987
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 02/10/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/10/1987
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 02/10/1987
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 02/10/1987
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 02/10/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 02/10/1987
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 02/10/1987
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 02/10/1987
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 02/10/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/10/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 02/10/1987
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 02/10/1987
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 02/10/1987
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 02/10/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 02/10/1987
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 02/10/1987
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/10/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 02/10/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 02/10/1987
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/10/1987
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/10/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/10/1987
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 02/10/1987
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 02/10/1987
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/26/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 02/26/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 02/26/1987
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/26/1987
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 02/26/1987
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 02/26/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/26/1987
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 02/26/1987
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 02/26/1987
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 02/26/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 02/26/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/26/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/26/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 03/23/1987
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 03/23/1987
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 03/23/1987
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/23/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 03/23/1987
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 03/23/1987
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 03/23/1987
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/23/1987
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/23/1987
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/23/1987
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/23/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/23/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 03/23/1987
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 03/23/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/23/1987
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 03/23/1987
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 03/23/1987
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 03/23/1987
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/23/1987
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 03/23/1987
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/23/1987
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/23/1987
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/23/1987
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 03/23/1987
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 03/23/1987
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 03/23/1987
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 03/23/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 03/23/1987
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/23/1987
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 03/23/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 03/23/1987
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 03/23/1987
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 03/23/1987
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 03/23/1987
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 03/23/1987
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/24/1987
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/24/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/30/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/30/1987