Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 09/16/1988
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 09/16/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/26/1988
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/26/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/26/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/26/1988
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 10/04/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/04/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 10/04/1988
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 10/06/1988
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 10/12/1988
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 10/19/1988