Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A concurrent resolution expressing the sense of the Congress that the Amateur Basketball Association United States of America and the United States Olympic Committee should promote the adoption of rules that would make all basketball players eligible to compete in the Olympic games and that the United States Olympic Committee should promote the adoption of rules that would make all athletes eligible to compete in the Olympic games.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/04/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/11/1988Referred to Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/04/1988Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/04/1988Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (138)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 10/04/1988
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 10/05/1988
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/05/1988
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/05/1988
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 10/05/1988
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 10/05/1988
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/05/1988
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 10/05/1988
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 10/05/1988
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/05/1988
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 10/05/1988
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 10/05/1988
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 10/05/1988
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 10/05/1988
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 10/05/1988
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 10/05/1988
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/05/1988
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/05/1988
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/05/1988
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 10/05/1988
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 10/05/1988
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 10/05/1988
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/05/1988
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 10/05/1988
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 10/05/1988
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 10/05/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 10/05/1988
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 10/05/1988
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 10/05/1988
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/05/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 10/05/1988
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 10/05/1988
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/05/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/05/1988
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 10/05/1988
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 10/05/1988
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 10/05/1988
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/05/1988
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 10/05/1988
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 10/05/1988
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 10/05/1988
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 10/05/1988
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/05/1988
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 10/05/1988
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 10/05/1988
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/05/1988
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/05/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 10/05/1988
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 10/05/1988
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/05/1988
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 10/05/1988
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 10/05/1988
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 10/05/1988
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 10/05/1988
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 10/05/1988
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 10/05/1988
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/05/1988
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/05/1988
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 10/05/1988
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 10/05/1988
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 10/05/1988
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 10/05/1988
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 10/05/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 10/05/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 10/05/1988
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/05/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 10/05/1988
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 10/05/1988
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/05/1988
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/05/1988
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/05/1988
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/05/1988
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/05/1988
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 10/05/1988
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 10/05/1988
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 10/05/1988
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 10/05/1988
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 10/05/1988
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/05/1988
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/05/1988
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/05/1988
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 10/05/1988
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 10/05/1988
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 10/05/1988
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 10/05/1988
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 10/05/1988
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/05/1988
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 10/05/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 10/05/1988
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 10/05/1988
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 10/05/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/06/1988
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 10/06/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 10/12/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary10/04/1988 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations10/11/1988 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.385.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.385. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/04/1988)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that: (1) the Amateur Basketball Association United States of America and the U.S. Olympic Committee should promote the adoption of rules that would make all basketball players eligible to compete in the Olympic games; and (2) the U.S. Olympic Committee should promote the elimination of the distinction between amateur and professional athletes in all sports for purposes of eligibility to compete in the Olympic games.