Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 02/19/1987
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 03/05/1987
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/05/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 03/05/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 03/05/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/05/1987
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/05/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/05/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/05/1987
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 03/05/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 03/05/1987
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 03/05/1987
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/05/1987
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 03/05/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/05/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/05/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 03/11/1987
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/11/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 03/11/1987
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 03/11/1987
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/11/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/11/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/11/1987
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 03/11/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/25/1987
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 03/25/1987
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/25/1987
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 03/25/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 03/25/1987
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/25/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 03/25/1987
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 03/25/1987
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 04/09/1987
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 04/09/1987
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 04/09/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 04/09/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/09/1987
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/09/1987
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 06/02/1987
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 06/02/1987
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 06/02/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/02/1987
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 06/02/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/02/1987
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 06/02/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 06/02/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/03/1987