Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 03/12/1987
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/12/1987
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 03/12/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 03/12/1987
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 03/12/1987
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/24/1987
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 03/24/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/24/1987
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 03/24/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/24/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 03/24/1987
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 03/24/1987
Rep. Sweeney, David McCann [R-TX-14] 03/24/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 03/24/1987
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 03/24/1987
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 03/24/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/24/1987
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 03/24/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/24/1987
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/24/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 03/24/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/24/1987
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 03/24/1987
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 03/24/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/24/1987
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/24/1987
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 04/29/1987
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 04/29/1987
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 04/29/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/29/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/29/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 04/29/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/29/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/29/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/29/1987
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 04/29/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/29/1987
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 04/29/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 04/29/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/29/1987
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/29/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/29/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/29/1987
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/29/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 04/29/1987
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 04/29/1987
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/29/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/02/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/02/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 06/02/1987
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 06/02/1987
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/02/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/02/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 06/02/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/02/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/02/1987
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 06/02/1987
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/02/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/02/1987
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/02/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/02/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/17/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/17/1987
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/17/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 06/17/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 06/17/1987
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/17/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/17/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/17/1987
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 06/17/1987
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/17/1987
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 06/17/1987
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 06/30/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/30/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 06/30/1987
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/30/1987
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 06/30/1987
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 09/21/1987