Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 03/18/1987
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 03/18/1987
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 03/18/1987
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 03/18/1987
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 03/18/1987
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/02/1987
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 06/02/1987
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/02/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/02/1987
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/02/1987
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 06/02/1987
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 06/02/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/17/1987
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 06/17/1987
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 06/17/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 06/17/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/17/1987
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/17/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/17/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/17/1987
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 06/17/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/17/1987
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/17/1987
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 06/17/1987
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 06/17/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 06/17/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/17/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/17/1987
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 06/17/1987
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/17/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/17/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/17/1987
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/17/1987
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 06/17/1987
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12] 06/17/1987
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/17/1987
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 06/17/1987
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/17/1987
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 06/17/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/17/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/17/1987
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/17/1987
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/17/1987
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 06/17/1987
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/17/1987
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 06/17/1987
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 06/17/1987
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/17/1987
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 06/17/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 06/17/1987
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/17/1987
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/17/1987
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 06/17/1987
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 06/25/1987
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/25/1987
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/25/1987
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 06/30/1987
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/30/1987
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 06/30/1987
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 06/30/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/30/1987
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 07/01/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 07/01/1987
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 07/01/1987
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 07/01/1987
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 07/13/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 07/13/1987
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 07/13/1987
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 08/03/1987
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 08/03/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 08/03/1987
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2] 09/09/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 09/09/1987
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/09/1987
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 09/09/1987
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/09/1987
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 09/09/1987
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 09/09/1987
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 09/09/1987
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/09/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 10/01/1987
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/01/1987
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/01/1987
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/01/1987
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 10/01/1987
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 10/14/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/14/1987
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/14/1987
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 10/14/1987
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 10/14/1987
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 11/10/1987
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 11/10/1987
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 11/10/1987
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 11/10/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 11/10/1987
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 11/10/1987
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42] 11/10/1987
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/10/1987
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 11/10/1987
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/17/1987
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 11/17/1987
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 11/30/1987
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/30/1987
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 11/30/1987
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 11/30/1987
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 12/03/1987
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 02/02/1988
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 02/02/1988
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 02/02/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 02/02/1988
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/02/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 02/02/1988
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 03/02/1988