Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 04/07/1987
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 04/07/1987
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 04/07/1987
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 04/07/1987
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 04/07/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/09/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/29/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/29/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 04/29/1987
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 05/06/1987
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 05/06/1987
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/19/1987
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 05/19/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/19/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/19/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/19/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/19/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 05/19/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 05/19/1987
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 05/19/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/19/1987
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/19/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/09/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/09/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/09/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/09/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 06/09/1987
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 06/09/1987
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/09/1987
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 06/16/1987
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/16/1987
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 06/16/1987
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 06/16/1987
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/16/1987
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/16/1987
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/16/1987
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 06/16/1987
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 06/16/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/16/1987
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/23/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/23/1987
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/23/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/23/1987
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 06/23/1987
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/23/1987
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 06/23/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 06/23/1987
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 06/23/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/23/1987
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 06/23/1987
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 06/25/1987
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/25/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/25/1987
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 06/25/1987
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 06/25/1987
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/08/1987
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/08/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/08/1987
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/08/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/08/1987
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 07/08/1987
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/22/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/22/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 07/22/1987
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 08/07/1987
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 08/07/1987
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/09/1987
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 09/09/1987
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/09/1987
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/09/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/09/1987
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/09/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/16/1987
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/29/1987
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/05/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 10/05/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 10/05/1987
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/05/1987
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/07/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 10/20/1987
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 10/20/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/21/1987