Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/02/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/03/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/10/1987
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 06/10/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/24/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/09/1987
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 07/09/1987
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 07/14/1987
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 07/14/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/21/1987
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 07/21/1987
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 07/28/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 08/07/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/09/1987
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/09/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/09/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 09/09/1987
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 09/09/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 09/09/1987
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 09/16/1987
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 09/16/1987
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 09/16/1987
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 10/01/1987
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 10/01/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/06/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 10/13/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/13/1987
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 10/13/1987
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/20/1987
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/20/1987
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 10/30/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/30/1987
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/30/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/30/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/30/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 11/03/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 11/03/1987
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/03/1987
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 11/03/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 11/10/1987
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 11/10/1987
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 11/17/1987
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 11/17/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 11/17/1987
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/17/1987
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/17/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 12/02/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 12/02/1987
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 12/02/1987
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 12/02/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 12/09/1987
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 12/21/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 12/21/1987
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 03/03/1988
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/03/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 03/09/1988