Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 07/14/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 07/14/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/14/1987
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 07/14/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 07/14/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 07/14/1987
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 07/14/1987
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 07/14/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/22/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/22/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/22/1987
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 07/22/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 07/22/1987
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/22/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 07/22/1987
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 07/22/1987
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/22/1987
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 07/30/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/30/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/30/1987
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 07/30/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/30/1987
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 07/30/1987
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 07/30/1987
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/30/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/30/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 07/30/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 07/30/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 08/07/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 08/07/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 08/07/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 08/07/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/10/1987
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/10/1987
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/10/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 09/10/1987
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42] 09/17/1987
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 10/01/1987
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 10/01/1987
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/01/1987
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/01/1987
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 10/05/1987
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 10/05/1987
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 10/07/1987
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 10/07/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 10/07/1987
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 10/13/1987
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 10/13/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 10/15/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 10/22/1987