Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/05/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 10/05/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 10/05/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 10/05/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 10/05/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 10/05/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/07/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 12/07/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 12/07/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 12/07/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 12/07/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 12/07/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/07/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/07/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 12/07/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 12/07/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 12/07/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 12/07/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 12/07/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 12/21/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 12/21/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 12/21/1987
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 12/21/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/17/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/17/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 05/17/1988
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 05/17/1988
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 05/17/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/17/1988
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 05/17/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/06/1988
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 07/06/1988
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/06/1988
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 07/06/1988
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 08/10/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 08/10/1988
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 08/10/1988
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/10/1988