Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate June 1988 as "National Recycling Month".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/28/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/05/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
10/28/1987Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/28/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (85)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33]* 10/28/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 11/16/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 11/16/1987
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 11/16/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 11/16/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 11/16/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 11/16/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 11/16/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 11/16/1987
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 11/16/1987
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 11/16/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 11/16/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 11/16/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 11/16/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 11/16/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/16/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 11/16/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 11/16/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 11/16/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 11/16/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 11/16/1987
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/16/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 11/16/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/16/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 11/16/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 11/16/1987
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 11/16/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/16/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 11/16/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 11/16/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 11/16/1987
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 11/16/1987
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 11/18/1987
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 11/18/1987
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 11/18/1987
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 11/18/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/18/1987
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 11/18/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/18/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 11/18/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 11/18/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 11/18/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 11/18/1987
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 11/18/1987
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 11/18/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 12/08/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 12/08/1987
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 12/08/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 12/08/1987
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 12/08/1987
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/08/1987
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 12/08/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 12/08/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 12/08/1987
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 12/08/1987
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 12/08/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 12/08/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 12/08/1987
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 12/08/1987
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 12/08/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 12/08/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 12/08/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 12/08/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 12/08/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 12/08/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 12/08/1987
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 12/08/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 12/08/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 12/08/1987
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 12/08/1987
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 12/17/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 12/17/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 12/17/1987
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 12/17/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 12/17/1987
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 12/17/1987
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 12/17/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 12/17/1987
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 12/17/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 12/17/1987
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 12/17/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 12/17/1987
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 12/17/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 12/17/1987
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 12/17/1987

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service10/28/1987 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population11/05/1987 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.389. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/28/1987)

Designates the month of June 1988 as National Recycling Month.