Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Raoul Wallenberg Monument Resolution

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A joint resolution to authorize the Raoul Wallenberg Tribute Committee to establish a monument to honor Raoul Wallenberg on Federal land in the District of Columbia or its environs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/17/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/23/1988Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials
11/20/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
11/17/1987Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/17/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (149)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 11/17/1987
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 11/17/1987
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 11/17/1987
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 11/17/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 12/18/1987
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 12/18/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/18/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 12/18/1987
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 12/18/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 12/18/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/18/1987
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 12/18/1987
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 12/18/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 12/18/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 12/18/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 12/18/1987
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 12/18/1987
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 12/18/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 12/18/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 12/18/1987
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 12/18/1987
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 12/18/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 12/18/1987
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 12/18/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 12/18/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 12/18/1987
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 12/18/1987
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 12/18/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 12/18/1987
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 12/18/1987
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 03/01/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 03/01/1988
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 03/16/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 03/16/1988
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 03/16/1988
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 03/16/1988
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 03/16/1988
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/16/1988
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/16/1988
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 03/16/1988
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 03/16/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 03/16/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/16/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/16/1988
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 03/16/1988
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 03/16/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 03/29/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/21/1988
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 04/21/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/21/1988
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/21/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/21/1988
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/21/1988
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/21/1988
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/21/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/21/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/21/1988
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/21/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/21/1988
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/21/1988
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 06/21/1988
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/21/1988
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/21/1988
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/21/1988
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 06/21/1988
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/21/1988
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/26/1988
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/26/1988
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42] 07/26/1988
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 07/26/1988
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 07/26/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/26/1988
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 07/26/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration11/17/1987 Referred to
House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials11/20/1987 Referred to
03/23/1988 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.403. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/17/1987)

Raoul Wallenberg Monument Resolution - Authorizes the Raoul Wallenberg Tribute Committee to establish a monument to honor Raoul Wallenberg on Federal land in the District of Columbia or its environs. Prohibits the United States from paying any expense of the establishment of the monument.