Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 04/29/1988
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 04/29/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 04/29/1988
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 04/29/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 04/29/1988
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/29/1988
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 04/29/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 04/29/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 04/29/1988
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3]* 04/29/1988
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/05/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 05/05/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/05/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/05/1988
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 05/05/1988
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 05/05/1988
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/05/1988
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 05/12/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 05/12/1988
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 05/12/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/12/1988
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 05/12/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/12/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/12/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/19/1988
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/19/1988
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 05/19/1988
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/02/1988
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/02/1988
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 06/10/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 06/16/1988
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 06/23/1988
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 08/04/1988