Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 06/22/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 06/22/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 06/22/1988
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 06/22/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 06/22/1988
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/13/1988
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 07/13/1988
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/13/1988
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/13/1988
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/13/1988
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 07/13/1988
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 07/13/1988
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 07/13/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/13/1988
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/13/1988
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 07/13/1988
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 07/13/1988
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 07/13/1988
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/13/1988
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 07/13/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 07/13/1988
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 07/13/1988
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/13/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 07/13/1988
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 07/27/1988
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 07/27/1988
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 07/27/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 07/27/1988
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/27/1988
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 07/27/1988
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 07/27/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 08/11/1988
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 08/11/1988
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 08/11/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 08/11/1988
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 08/11/1988
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 08/11/1988
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 08/11/1988
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 08/11/1988
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 09/07/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/07/1988
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/23/1988
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 09/23/1988
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 09/23/1988
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/23/1988
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12] 10/21/1988
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 10/21/1988