Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 09/23/1988
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 09/26/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 09/26/1988
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 09/26/1988
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/30/1988
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 09/30/1988
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 09/30/1988
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/30/1988
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/30/1988
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/30/1988
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/30/1988
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 09/30/1988
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 09/30/1988
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/30/1988
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 09/30/1988
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 09/30/1988
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 09/30/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/30/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 09/30/1988
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 09/30/1988
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 09/30/1988
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 09/30/1988
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 09/30/1988
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 09/30/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/30/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 09/30/1988
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 09/30/1988
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 10/04/1988
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 10/04/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 10/04/1988
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/04/1988
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 10/04/1988
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/04/1988
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 10/04/1988
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 10/04/1988
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/04/1988
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 10/04/1988
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 10/04/1988
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 10/04/1988
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 10/04/1988
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 10/04/1988
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 10/04/1988
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 10/04/1988
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 10/04/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 10/04/1988
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/06/1988
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/06/1988
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/06/1988
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 10/06/1988
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 10/06/1988
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 10/06/1988
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 10/06/1988
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/06/1988
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 10/06/1988
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 10/06/1988
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 10/06/1988
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 10/06/1988
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 10/06/1988
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 10/06/1988
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 10/06/1988
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42] 10/06/1988
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 10/06/1988
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/06/1988
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/06/1988
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 10/06/1988
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/06/1988
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 10/06/1988
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 10/06/1988
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 10/06/1988
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/06/1988
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/06/1988
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/06/1988
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/06/1988
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/06/1988
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 10/06/1988
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/06/1988
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 10/06/1988
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 10/06/1988
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 10/06/1988
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 10/06/1988
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 10/06/1988
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 10/06/1988
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 10/11/1988
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 10/11/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 10/12/1988
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/12/1988
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/18/1988
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 10/18/1988
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/18/1988
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/19/1988
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 10/19/1988
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 10/19/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 10/20/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/20/1988
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 10/20/1988
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 10/20/1988