Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 02/03/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/10/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/10/1987
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 02/19/1987
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/19/1987
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/19/1987
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 03/03/1987
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 03/03/1987
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/03/1987
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/04/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 03/04/1987
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 03/10/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 03/10/1987
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/10/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 03/10/1987
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/10/1987
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 03/10/1987
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 03/10/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 03/10/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/10/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 03/10/1987
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/10/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 03/10/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 03/10/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 03/10/1987
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/10/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/10/1987
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 03/10/1987
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/10/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 03/10/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/10/1987
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 03/10/1987
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 03/10/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/10/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 03/10/1987
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/11/1987
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/11/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/11/1987
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 03/11/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/11/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 03/11/1987
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 03/11/1987
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/11/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 03/11/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/11/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/11/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 03/11/1987
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 03/11/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/16/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/16/1987
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 03/16/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/16/1987
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 03/16/1987
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/16/1987
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/16/1987
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/16/1987
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/16/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/16/1987
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 03/16/1987
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 03/16/1987
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 03/16/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/16/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/16/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/16/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/17/1987
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 03/17/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/17/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/17/1987
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/17/1987
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 03/17/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/23/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/23/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 03/23/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/23/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/24/1987
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 03/24/1987
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 03/24/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 03/24/1987
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 03/24/1987
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 03/24/1987
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 03/24/1987
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 03/24/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/26/1987
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/26/1987
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 03/26/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 03/26/1987
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2] 03/26/1987
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/31/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 03/31/1987
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 03/31/1987
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/31/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/31/1987
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/01/1987
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 04/01/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/01/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/01/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/01/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/01/1987
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/01/1987
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 04/06/1987
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 04/06/1987
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 04/06/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/06/1987
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 04/06/1987
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 04/06/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/06/1987
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 04/08/1987
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 04/08/1987
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 04/08/1987
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 04/08/1987
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 04/08/1987
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 04/08/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/08/1987
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 04/08/1987
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 04/08/1987
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/08/1987
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 04/08/1987
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/08/1987
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 04/08/1987
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 04/08/1987
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/08/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/08/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/08/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/08/1987
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/08/1987
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/09/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 04/09/1987
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 04/09/1987
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/09/1987
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/09/1987
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 04/09/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/09/1987
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 04/21/1987
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/21/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/1987
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/21/1987
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 04/21/1987
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/21/1987
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 04/21/1987
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/21/1987
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/21/1987
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 04/21/1987
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 04/23/1987
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/23/1987
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 04/23/1987
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/23/1987
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 04/23/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/23/1987
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/23/1987
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/23/1987
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 04/28/1987
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/28/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/28/1987
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 04/28/1987
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/29/1987
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 04/29/1987
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/29/1987
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 04/29/1987
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/29/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/29/1987
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 05/04/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/04/1987
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/06/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/06/1987
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/06/1987
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/11/1987
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 05/18/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/18/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 05/18/1987
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 05/20/1987
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 05/20/1987
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 05/27/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/28/1987
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 05/28/1987
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 06/02/1987
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/02/1987