Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the processing of applications from Cuban nationals for refugee status and immigrant visas.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/22/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
04/28/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/22/1987Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/22/1987
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL]* 04/22/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/16/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 09/18/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 10/01/1987
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 10/01/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 10/07/1987

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary04/22/1987 Referred to
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs04/28/1987 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1075.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1075. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/22/1987)

Provides for the processing of current and former Cuban political prisoners as refugees for U.S. entry regardless of the length of such imprisonment.

Provides for the issuance of immigrant visas to Cuban nationals without regard to: (1) a section of the Immigration and Nationality Act relating to the refusual to accept the return of nationals; (2) the visa application site; or (3) the date of departure from Cuba for persons applying for visas outside Cuba.