Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/23/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 04/23/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/23/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 04/23/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 04/23/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 04/23/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/23/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 04/23/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/23/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 04/23/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/23/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 04/23/1987
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 05/06/1987
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/20/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/27/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/11/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/17/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 07/07/1987
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 07/09/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/28/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 09/25/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/29/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/21/1988
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 03/25/1988
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/14/1988
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 04/14/1988
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 04/21/1988
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/29/1988
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/06/1988
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 06/29/1988
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/27/1988
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 08/01/1988
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 08/09/1988