Committees: S.1085 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Governmental Affairs04/23/1987 Referred to
06/17/1987 Hearings by
08/04/1987 Markup by
09/24/1987 Reported by S.Rept 100-173
Senate Armed Services10/09/1987 Referred to
11/19/1987 Markup by
11/20/1987 Reported by S.Rept 100-232
Senate Armed Services Subcommittee on Strategic Forces and Nuclear Deterrence11/03/1987 Hearings by