Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 06/10/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 06/10/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 06/10/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/10/1987
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 06/10/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/10/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 06/16/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 08/03/1987
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 08/03/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 08/03/1987
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 08/06/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/07/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/23/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 11/13/1987
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 11/13/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/17/1987