Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/29/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 04/29/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/11/1987
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/11/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/11/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 06/26/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/01/1987
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 07/09/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 07/24/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/11/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/11/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 10/23/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 10/23/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 11/05/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 11/18/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 01/28/1988
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/20/1988