Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Marine Science, Technology, and Resource Development Act of 1987

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Marine Science, Technology, and Resource Development Act of 1987

Short Titles as Introduced

Marine Science, Technology, and Resource Development Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the enhanced understanding and wise use of ocean, coastal, and Great Lakes resources by strengthening the National Sea Grant College and by initiating a Strategic Coastal Research Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
08/05/1987Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/31/1987Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Jointly reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment. With written report No. 100-135.
07/31/1987Committee on Commerce. Jointly reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment. With written report No. 100-135.
05/13/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date
08/07/1987Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Action By: Senate
08/05/1987Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
Action By: Senate
07/31/1987Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
Action By: Senate
07/31/1987Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Jointly reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment. With written report No. 100-135.
07/31/1987Committee on Commerce. Jointly reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment. With written report No. 100-135.
07/08/1987Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/16/1987Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
05/26/1987Committee on Labor and Human Resources requested executive comment from Education Department, GAO, OMB.
05/26/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Education, Arts, Humanities.
Action By: Committee on Labor and Human Resources
05/13/1987Committee on Commerce. Hearings held in conjunction with the National Ocean Policy Study.
05/13/1987Read twice and referred jointly to the Committees on Commerce; Labor and Human Resources pursuant to the order of May 12, 1987.
Action By: Senate

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/13/1987 Referred to
05/13/1987 Hearings by
06/16/1987 Markup by
07/31/1987 Reported by S.Rept 100-135
Senate Labor and Human Resources05/13/1987 Referred to
07/08/1987 Markup by
07/31/1987 Reported by S.Rept 100-135
Senate Labor and Human Resources Subcommittee on Education, Arts and Humanities05/26/1987 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1196.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1196. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (08/05/1987)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Marine Science, Technology, and Resource Development Act of 1987 - Amends the National Sea Grant College Program Act to declare the need for a national ocean policy and to revise definitions under such Act. Expands coverage of such Act to include Great Lakes resources. (Current law covers ocean and coastal resources.)

Requires the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (Administrator) to develop and publish every three years the Sea Grant Strategic Research Plan (Plan) identifying and describing a limited number of priority areas for strategic marine research. Requires the Plan to be submitted to specified congressional committees. Describes the priority area on which the Plan shall concentrate, including: (1) critical resource and environmental areas of national or global scope where adequate funding is otherwise precluded under other provisions of the National Sea Grant College Program Act; and (2) areas where sustained programmatic research and technology transfer can be utilized.

Authorizes the Secretary of Commerce (Secretary) to make grants to carry out such strategic marine research to sea grant colleges, programs, regional consortia, and individuals meeting certain criteria. Authorizes appropriations for such purposes for FY 1988 through 1992.

Describes the academic, congressional, Federal, and postdoctoral fellowships which may be awarded.

Adds to the duties of the sea grant review panel the responsibility of giving advice with respect to applications, proposals, performance, grants, and contracts awarded under the Sea Grant Strategic Research Plan.

Authorizes appropriations for the National Sea Grant College Program for FY 1988 through 1992.

Amends provisions of the Sea Grant Program Improvement Act of 1976 relating to the purposes of the Sea Grant International program to authorize grants and contracts to enhance international research, promote marine activities with foreign universities, encourage technology transfer, and promote foreign data exchanges. Authorizes appropriations for such purposes for FY 1988 through 1992. Allows additional funding to be provided through other Federal program elements with a marine science or technology transfer component, or both.