Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 01/06/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 01/28/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 01/28/1987
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/26/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/26/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 03/11/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/11/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/13/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/13/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/13/1987
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/13/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 03/17/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 03/17/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/17/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/17/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 03/17/1987
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/19/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/19/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/19/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/23/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/23/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/23/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/30/1987
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 04/01/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/03/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 04/03/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/03/1987
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 04/06/1987
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 04/08/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/08/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 04/09/1987
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/10/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/10/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 04/22/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 04/22/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 04/22/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 04/27/1987
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/29/1987
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/01/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/06/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 05/06/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 05/06/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 05/06/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/08/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/08/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 05/08/1987
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 05/08/1987
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/08/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 05/08/1987
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/08/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/08/1987
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 05/08/1987
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/08/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/08/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/08/1987