Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

De Soto National Trail Study Act of 1987

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

De Soto National Trail Study Act of 1987

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

De Soto National Trail Study Act of 1987

Short Titles as Introduced

De Soto National Trail Study Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the National Trails System Act to provide for a study of the De Soto Trail, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/11/1987Became Public Law No: 100-187.
12/11/1987Signed by President.
12/02/1987Presented to President.
12/01/1987Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
12/01/1987Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-462.
10/01/1987Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
09/25/1987Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with amendments. With written report No. 100-177.
05/29/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber
12/11/1987Became Public Law No: 100-187.
12/11/1987Signed by President.
12/02/1987SenatePresented to President.
12/02/1987SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
12/01/1987HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
12/01/1987HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
12/01/1987HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 294.
12/01/1987HouseReported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-462.
11/18/1987HouseOrdered to be Reported.
11/18/1987HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/18/1987HouseExecutive Comment Received From Interior.
11/03/1987HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
11/03/1987HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
11/03/1987HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
10/19/1987HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
10/09/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
10/06/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
10/06/1987SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/01/1987SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
10/01/1987SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Interior Department. Favorable.
09/25/1987SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 340.
09/25/1987SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with amendments. With written report No. 100-177.
09/16/1987SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
09/10/1987SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Agriculture Department. Favorable.
07/30/1987SenateSubcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests
07/13/1987SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department, OMB.
05/29/1987SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
05/29/1987SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/29/1987 Referred to
09/16/1987 Markup by
09/25/1987 Reported by S.Rept 100-177
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests05/29/1987 Referred to
07/30/1987 Hearings by
House Interior and Insular Affairs10/06/1987 Referred to
11/18/1987 Markup by
12/01/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-462
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands10/09/1987 Referred to
11/03/1987 Hearings by
11/03/1987 Markup by
11/03/1987 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1297. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/01/1987)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

De Soto National Trail Study Act of 1987 - Amends the National Trails System Act to designate the De Soto Trail, extending through Florida, Georgia, South Carolina, North Carolina, Tennessee, Alabama, Mississippi, Arkansas, Texas, and Louisiana, for study for inclusion in such System.