Committees: S.1297 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/29/1987 Referred to
09/16/1987 Markup by
09/25/1987 Reported by S.Rept 100-177
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests05/29/1987 Referred to
07/30/1987 Hearings by
House Interior and Insular Affairs10/06/1987 Referred to
11/18/1987 Markup by
12/01/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-462
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands10/09/1987 Referred to
11/03/1987 Hearings by
11/03/1987 Markup by
11/03/1987 Reported by