Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 04/14/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/14/1988
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 04/14/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/14/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/27/1988
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/10/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/19/1988
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 10/05/1988