Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/11/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/08/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/22/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 07/23/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 12/22/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/15/1988
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 03/15/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 03/17/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/11/1988
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/06/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/14/1988
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/14/1988
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 06/23/1988
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/27/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/27/1988
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 07/07/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/07/1988
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/07/1988
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 08/10/1988
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/14/1988
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/14/1988