Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 06/09/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/18/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/18/1987
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/23/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/22/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/22/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/29/1987
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 08/05/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 08/05/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 08/07/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 11/17/1987
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 12/08/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 04/15/1988