There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for setting aside the first Thursday in May as the date on which the National Day of Prayer is celebrated.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
05/05/1988Became Public Law No: 100-307.
05/05/1988Signed by President.
05/04/1988Presented to President.
05/02/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
05/02/1988House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/22/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
04/20/1988Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Byrd for Senator Biden without amendment. Without written report.
06/17/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/05/1988Became Public Law No: 100-307.
05/05/1988Signed by President.
05/04/1988SenatePresented to President.
05/03/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
05/02/1988HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
05/02/1988HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
05/02/1988HouseHouse Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/27/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
04/27/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
04/25/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
04/25/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/22/1988SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
04/20/1988SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 617.
04/20/1988SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Byrd for Senator Biden without amendment. Without written report.
04/14/1988SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/17/1987SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (18)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary06/17/1987 Referred to
04/14/1988 Markup by
04/20/1988 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service04/25/1988 Referred to
04/27/1988 Markup by
05/02/1988 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.1378.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1378. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/17/1987)

Amends Federal law to direct the President to set aside and proclaim the first Thursday in May in each year as a National Day of Prayer. (Current law directs the President to set aside and proclaim a suitable day each year, other than a Sunday, for such purpose.)