Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 06/26/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 06/26/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/30/1987
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/01/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 07/08/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/08/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 07/08/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/08/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 07/15/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/28/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/28/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 07/29/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 07/31/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/31/1987
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 08/03/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 08/06/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 08/06/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 08/06/1987
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 09/16/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 09/30/1987
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/30/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/01/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/01/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 10/30/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/05/1987