Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/30/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 07/30/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 08/03/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/04/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 08/06/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 08/06/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/06/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 08/06/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 08/06/1987
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 08/07/1987
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 08/07/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 08/07/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 08/07/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 08/07/1987
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/09/1987
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/11/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 09/11/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/11/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/11/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 09/11/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/11/1987
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/11/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/11/1987
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 09/11/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/11/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/11/1987
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 09/11/1987
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 09/11/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 10/01/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/10/1988
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/16/1988
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/23/1988
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 05/26/1988
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 05/26/1988
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/26/1988
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 06/14/1988
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 06/14/1988