Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/21/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 07/21/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/24/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 07/28/1987
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 07/28/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 07/29/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/06/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 08/06/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 08/07/1987
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/09/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/14/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 10/20/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/22/1987
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 10/23/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 10/23/1987
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 10/28/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 11/04/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/04/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 11/04/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 11/04/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 11/04/1987
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 11/04/1987
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 11/04/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 11/04/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/04/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 11/04/1987
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/04/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/04/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 11/04/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 11/04/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 11/04/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 11/04/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/04/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/04/1987
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 11/04/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/04/1987
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 11/04/1987
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/04/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 11/04/1987
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 11/20/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 01/26/1988